CA AB811 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19635 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees: rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19635Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback