CA AB811 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4216.6 of the Government Code, relating to excavations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excavations: regional notification center system: contractor certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 811 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB811 Lowenthal (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 811 LOWENTHAL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2013-08-19AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2584.).
2013-08-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1844.).
2013-07-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2013-06-04SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-05-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1409.)
2013-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2013-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2013-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B.,P. & C.P.
2013-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2013-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7058.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code4216Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4216.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4216.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_811&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130603_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130823_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130909_chaptered.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20130906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20130507_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20130513_0123PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20130703_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20130815_1156AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20130819_1241PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback