CA AB811 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1789.30 and 1789.35 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 13004.1 and 14610.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to identification documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 811 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB811 John A. Perez By Wright (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 811 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-10 Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
2009-09-02 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2906.)
2009-09-01 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-31 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2018.)
2009-08-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-18 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-07-23 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-01 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-29 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-16 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-15 Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-15 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-11 Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2009-05-27 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-26 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1671.)
2009-05-18 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2009-05-06 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-05-05 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-14 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 13).
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on B. & F.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-26 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1789.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1789.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13004.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code14610.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_811&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20090226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20090505_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20090616_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20090723_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_bill_20090908_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090513_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090526_0108PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090714_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090831_0455PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_811_vote_20090902_1222PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback