CA AB807 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 806 to the Evidence Code, and to add Sections 686.3 and 1127i to the Penal Code, relating to criminal investigations.
Title
Criminal investigations: eyewitness identification.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 807 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 807 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading By JONES Amend By CONWAY Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 807 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 807 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading By JONES Amend By CONWAY Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 5. Page 2304.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 1689.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 806 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1202.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13010.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13012.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 686.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |