CA AB798 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 165, 2501, 2510, and 12527 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: fire department: federally recognized tribes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 798 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB798 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 798 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB798 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 798 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2632.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2237.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1409.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12527 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |