CA AB796 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5100 of, to amend and renumber Sections 2263, 2265, 2266, 2267, 2268, 2269, and 2270 of, to amend, renumber, and add Sections 2262 and 2264 of, to add Sections 2272, 2273, 2274, and 2276 to, and to add and repeal Section 2275 of, the Elections Code, relating to voter registration.
Title
Voter registration: California New Motor Voter Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 796 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB796 Berman et al. By Newman (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 796 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB796 Berman et al. By Newman (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 796 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 314, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2736.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2300.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1692.) (June 28). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and TRANS. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1647.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and TRANS. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2262 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2264 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 2275 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |