CA AB794 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16428.9 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 39712, 43015, 44274, and 44282 of, to add Sections 39501, 39602.6, and 44295.5 to, and to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 39680) to Part 2 of Division 26 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Air pollution: purchase of new drayage and short-haul trucks: incentive programs: eligibility: labor standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 794 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB794 Carrillo et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 794 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB794 Carrillo et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 794 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2993.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2495.). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q., L., P.E. & R. and TRANS. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 1846.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1580.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on TRANS.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1023.) |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and TRANS. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16428.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39602.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 43015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44295.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |