CA AB794 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 600 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Criminal acts against law enforcement animals.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 AB794 Linder (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 794 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 794 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1790.). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1225.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |