CA AB79 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 9:00 am in Senate Chamber
Hearing: Jan 28 in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 79 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-01-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-11AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-01-11AssemblyWithout reference to committee.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback