CA AB785 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1635, 1644, 1644.1, 1644.2, 1644.3, 102425, 102750, 102766, and 102768 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to parentage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parentage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 785 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB785 Bloom By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB785 Bloom By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 785 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 539, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3420.).
2019-09-11 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2759.).
2019-09-09 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-06 Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06 Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2019-09-03 In Senate. Held at Desk.
2019-09-03 Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
2019-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-22AssemblyEnrolled measure version corrected.
2019-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2202.).
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback