CA AB782 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 25 (commencing with Section 22757) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 16644) to Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to add Chapter 2.10 (commencing with Section 2700) to Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, and to add Section 19547.7 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to child labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congo Child Labor Act of 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22757New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16644New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code2700New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19547.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback