CA AB779 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.1 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: deputy sheriffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB779 Bigelow et al. By McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 779 Bigelow Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 779 Bigelow Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2458.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 1065.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 6). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 830.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |