CA AB772 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1596.799 of, and to add Section 1596.7916 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child day care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Assembly - AB 772 Jackson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-06-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2024-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2024-05-01SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2024-01-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-01-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3883.)
2024-01-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2024-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2024-01-03AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2023-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2023-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2023-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2023-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1596.7916New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1596.799Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback