CA AB765 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 104665) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Health Checkout Aisles for Healthy Families Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104665 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB765 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB765 |