CA AB763 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14683 of, and to add Section 14682.2 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal specialty mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 763 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1943.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback