CA AB762 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17212 and 17251 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 17235) to Chapter 1 of Part 10.5 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 21151.8 of the Public Resources Code, relating to schoolsites.
Title
Hazardous emissions and substances: schoolsites: private and charter schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 762 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 762 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1693.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and ED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 1730.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 28). |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and ED. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21151.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |