CA AB761 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15301 of the Government Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State armories: homeless shelters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 761 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB761 Nazarian et al. By Archuleta (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 761 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3109.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2454.).
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on V.A.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15301Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback