CA AB76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14041.5 of, to add Section 41207.48 to, and to add and repeal Section 84321.61 of, the Education Code, and to amend Item 6870-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019), relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: apportionments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 76 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - WORF AB76 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 76 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - WORF AB76 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 76 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4859.). |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 4858.) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3712.). |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2020-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1165.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14041.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41207.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 84321.61 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |