CA AB759 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3010, 3050.7, 3066, 3067, 3068, 3070, 3072, 3072.5, 3073, 3074, 3078, 3079, 11705, 11713.1, 11713.3, and 11713.23 of, and to add Sections 3080, 3081, and 3082 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to recreational vehicles.
Title
Recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 759 LINDER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB759 Linder By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 759 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB759 Linder By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 759 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 407, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3077.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2631.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11713.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11713.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11713.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3050.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3067 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3068 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3072.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3078 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3079 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 3080 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 3081 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 3082 | New Code | See Bill Text |