CA AB754 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10632 and 10826.2 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water management planning: water shortages.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Papan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 754 Papan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 754 Papan Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 754 Papan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 754 Papan Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 1585.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10826.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |