CA AB754 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-01 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10720.7 and 10735.2 of the Water Code, relating to groundwater.
Title
Sustainable groundwater management: groundwater sustainability plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [07-13-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 754 Mathis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 754 Mathis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 1852.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10720.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10735.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |