CA AB751 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 623, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 623, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 103526 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.
Title
Vital records: certified copies: electronic requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 751 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB751 Irwin et al. By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 751 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB751 Irwin et al. By Umberg (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Assembly - AB 751 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 623, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2735.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2288.). |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1281.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103526 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |