CA AB751 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 666.5 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 10851 of the Vehicle Code, relating to theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft: motor vehicle: penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-14 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-25 From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2010-01-12 In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-04-28 In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-04-14 In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. In committee: Reconsideration granted.
2009-03-23 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-26 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code666.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code10851Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback