CA AB750 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Division 5 (commencing with Section 64160) of Title 6.7 of the Government Code, relating to finance.
Title
Finance: investment trust blue ribbon task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 750 HUESO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB750 Hueso By Vargas (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 750 HUESO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB750 Hueso By Vargas (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 750 HUESO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3200.). | |
2011-09-08 | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2392.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2423.). | |
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |
2011-06-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1741.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-09 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 64160 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |