CA AB744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2290.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1374.13 of, and to add Section 1374.14 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.85 of, and to add Section 10123.855 to, the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 14132.725 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: telehealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB744 Aguiar-Curry By Dodd (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 744 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 744 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3562.).
2019-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2919.).
2019-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-10SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2733.)
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1941.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2019-02-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback