CA AB740 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2093 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to oaths and affirmations.
Title
Oaths and affirmations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB740 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - AB 740 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - AB 740 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1843.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1016.) |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 2093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |