CA AB74 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 12670.22 and 12670.23 to the Water Code, relating to flood control.
Title
Flood control: Middle Creek and Hamilton City Flood
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-04 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB74 Chesbro (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 74 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 74 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2223.) | |
2009-09-02 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1828.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-03-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-09 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2009-03-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 16. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12670.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 12670.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |