CA AB737 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1301 of, and to add and repeal Section 1302 of, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to the California Vietnam Veterans Memorial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Vietnam Veterans Memorial.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-01-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and RLS.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1301Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code1302Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback