CA AB734 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 959, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 959, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.6.7 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: Oakland Sports and Mixed-Use Project.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 734 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB734 Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 734 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB734 Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 734 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 959, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 6159.). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5855.) |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 1479.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53395.3.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 53398.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |