CA AB734 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53304 to the Education Code, relating to school intervention.
Title
School intervention: parent empowerment: petition appeal.
Sponsors
Asm. Young Kim [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 53300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 53304 | New Code | See Bill Text |