CA AB732 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25163 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous waste: transportation: registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 11).
2022-01-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2022-01-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-07AssemblyIn committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25163Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback