CA AB726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 334, 335, 336, 337, 338, 339, 340, 341, 341.1, 341.2, 341.3, 341.4, 341.5, 347, 348, 349, 352, and 359 of, to add Sections 399.23 and 745.5 to, and to repeal and add Section 359.5 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 726 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 726 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1826.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |