CA AB723 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29140 and 98290 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 7292.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Transactions and use taxes: County of Alameda: Santa Cruz Metropolitan Transit District.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 723 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Archuleta, Moorlach, Roth (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Quirk By Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 723 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Archuleta, Moorlach, Roth (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Quirk By Wieckowski (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 723 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 747, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 3558.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 13). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3542.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2862.). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 10) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1516.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 29140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 98290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7292.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |