CA AB722 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 101850 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alameda Health System Hospital Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB722 Bonta et al. By Wahab (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 722 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2023.
2023-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2392.).
2023-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2023-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-05-17SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
2023-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1483.)
2023-04-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1297.)
2023-03-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 29).
2023-02-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2023-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code101850Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback