CA AB717 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3007.06 to, and to repeal and add Section 3007.05 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 14902 of the Vehicle Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: identification cards.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 717 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 717 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 1730.) |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1639.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3007.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 14902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |