CA AB715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 103870.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to Parkinson’s disease.
Title
Richard Paul Hemann Parkinson’s Disease Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 715 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB715 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 715 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB715 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 715 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3472.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2712.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2072.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103870.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |