CA AB715 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65995 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Residential development: school facilities fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Assembly - AB 715 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB715 Daly By Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 715 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB715 Daly By Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 715 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 120, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2170.). |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1615.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 1556.) |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65995 | Amended Code | Citation Text |