CA AB715 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to land conservation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Land conservation: subventions to local government:
Sponsors
Asm. Juan Arambula [D] | Asm. Sam Blakeslee [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 715 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 715 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-07-15 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-06-29 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-06-17 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16). | |
2010-06-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-05-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-17 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | |
2009-06-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-06-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1451.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |
2009-05-04 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |