CA AB712 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 20142, 20395, 20405, 20614, and 20998 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Local Agency Public Construction Act: change orders: County of Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AB 712 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB712 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 712 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB712 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 712 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2122.). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1541.) |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20395 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20998 | Amended Code | Citation Text |