CA AB711 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25600 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer manufacturers: free or discounted rides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-28 - Assembly - AB 711 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB711 Low et al. By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 711 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 226, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2790.).
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2179.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1720.)
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2017-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and C. & C.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23009Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback