CA AB71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Luz Rivas.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23036.3 of, and to add Sections 17087.7 and 25110.1 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 8255 and 8257 of, to add Sections 8257.1, 8257.2, 8258, and 14133.5 to, and to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 13050) to Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness funding: Bring California Home Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Luz Rivas.
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29).
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-15AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-01-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback