CA AB71 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 47634 to, to repeal Sections 41311, 42243.7, 47634.1, 47634.4, 49452.8, 49501, 49536, 52244, and 52272 of, to repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 400) of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 8150) of Chapter 1 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 37252) of Chapter 2 of Part 22 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 10 (commencing with Section 41850) of Chapter 5 of Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 42290) of Chapter 7 of Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 11.3 (commencing with Section 42920) of Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 44279.1), Article 11 (commencing with Section 44380), Article 12 (commencing with Section 44390), and Article 13 (commencing with Section 44395) of Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 44500), Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 44510), and Article 6 (commencing with Section 44560) of Chapter 3 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 3.34 (commencing with Section 44730) and Chapter 3.36 (commencing with Section 44735) of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 48660) of Chapter 4 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 11 (commencing with Section 49550) and Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 49565) of Chapter 9 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 15 (commencing with Section 51870) of Chapter 5 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 52055.600) of Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 52060) of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 52180) of Chapter 7 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 52200) of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 52378) and Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 52460) of Chapter 9 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 52890) of Chapter 12 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 12.5 (commencing with Section 52920) of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 54020) of Chapter 1 of Part 29 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 54690) and Article 7.1 (commencing with Section 54740) of Chapter 9 of Part 29 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 58800) of Part 31 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 60240) of Chapter 2 of Part 33 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 99200) of Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of, and to repeal and add Chapter 3.2 (commencing with Section 41500) of Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to public school finance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Categorical education funding: block grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-31 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 14. | |
2008-12-12 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41311 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42243.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47634 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 47634.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47634.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49452.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49501 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49536 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52244 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52272 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_71&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_71_bill_20081212_introduced.html |