CA AB706 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-01 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9114.5 and 9123 of the Government Code, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislature: facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 706 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 706 Cooley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1713.) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 9114.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 9123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |