CA AB704 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17201.8 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: deduction: qualified education loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 10).
2022-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-22AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17201.8Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback