CA AB701 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 138.7 of, and to add Part 8.6 (commencing with Section 2100) to Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Warehouse distribution centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 701 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB701 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Becker (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 701 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB701 Lorena Gonzalez et a By Becker (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 701 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 197, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 3032.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2505.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1687.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 138.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2100 | New Code | See Bill Text |