CA AB690 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6401.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal document assistants and unlawful detainer assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB690 Chen By Wilk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 690 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-19 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2619.).
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2023-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-04-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
2023-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2023-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-02-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2023-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6401.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback