CA AB689 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13823.15 of the Penal Code, relating to domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Statewide Domestic Violence Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-23 - Assembly - AB 689 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB689 Petrie-Norris et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 689 Petrie-Norris Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2021.
2021-08-31 Approved by the Governor.
2021-08-24 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-07-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-06-24SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1408.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13823.15Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback