CA AB689 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27581.4 of, and to add Sections 27561.5, 27581.1, 27583, 27583.2, 27583.4, 27584, and 27585 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to eggs.
Title
Marketing of eggs: violations: administrative and civil penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB 689 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB689 Dodd By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 689 DODD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB689 Dodd By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 689 DODD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2674.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2201.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 27561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27581.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27581.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27581.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27583 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27583.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27583.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27584 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 27585 | New Code | See Bill Text |