CA AB681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4320 of the Family Code, relating to spousal support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spousal support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 681 MELENDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB681 Melendez By Walters (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Assembly - AB 681 MELENDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-01 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2791.).
2013-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2013-08-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2013-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1886.).
2013-07-08SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2013-06-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-05-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 11. Page 882.)
2013-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 2).
2013-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2013-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code4320Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code4324.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code4011.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_681&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130221_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130409_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130708_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_bill_20131001_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130411_1009AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130702_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130819_0205PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_681_vote_20130830_1035AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback