CA AB680 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 8 (commencing with Section 38599.10) to Division 25.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to the Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: California Jobs Plan Act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 680 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB680 Burke By Bradford (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 680 Burke Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14.).
2021-09-10AssemblyOrdered to the unfinished business file.
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12).
2021-07-05SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1695.) (June 28).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and E.Q.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and NAT. RES.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38599.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback